EP0567269 - Clock generators having programmable fractional frequency division [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1993/43] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bays, Laurence Edward 2821 Hampton Court Allentown, Pennsylvania 18103 / US | 02 /
Norsworthy, Steven Robert 6365 Woodfern Drive Emmaus, Pennsylvania 18049 / US | [1993/43] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1993/43] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302911.8 | 15.04.1993 | [1993/43] | Priority number, date | US19920871945 | 22.04.1992 Original published format: US 871945 | [1993/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0567269 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0567269 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03K23/66, G06F7/68 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
G06F7/68 (EP,US);
G06F1/04 (KR);
H03K23/667 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/43] | H03K23/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/43] | Title | German: | Taktgenerator mit fraktionell programmierbarer Frequenzteilung | [1993/43] | English: | Clock generators having programmable fractional frequency division | [1993/43] | French: | Générateur d'horloge comportant une division fractionnaire programmable de fréquence | [1993/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 30.09.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03195217 ; | [A]JPS63167527 ; | [A]US4658406 (PAPPAS ANDREAS [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 21; figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP0431629 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 41 - page 6, line 48 *; | [A]EP0471506 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 57 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911119), vol. 15, no. 454, Database accession no. (E - 1135), & JP03195217 A 00000000 (SONY CORP.) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881114), vol. 12, no. 430, Database accession no. (E - 682), & JP63167527 A 00000000 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |