EP0567277 - Bypass injector valve for variable cycle aircraft engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/43] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Mark Joseph 7947 Shelldale Way Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
Carey, John Philip 14338 Marlborough Lane Upper Marlboro, Maryland 20772 / US | [1993/43] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1993/43] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302992.8 | 19.04.1993 | [1993/43] | Priority number, date | US19920870847 | 20.04.1992 Original published format: US 870847 | [1993/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567277 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F02K3/075, F02K3/077 | [1993/43] | CPC: |
F02K3/075 (EP);
F02K3/077 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/43] | Title | German: | Abzweigventil für ein Bläsertriebwerk mit variablen Arbeitszyklen | [1993/43] | English: | Bypass injector valve for variable cycle aircraft engines | [1993/43] | French: | Clapet de détour pour un réacteur à cycle variable | [1993/43] | File destroyed: | 06.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/04] | 23.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3879941 ; | [A]FR2296769 ; | [A]US3153904 ; | [A]US4409788 ; | [A]GB2110762 ; | [A]US4290262 |