EP0568234 - Apparatus for, and a method of, placing an insert in a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUINNESS BREWING WORLDWIDE LIMITED Park Royal Brewery London NW10 7RR / GB | [1993/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lockington, Derek C. 17 Foxhill, Whissendine Oakham, Leicestershire, LE15 7HP / GB | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Walters, Frederick James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Walters, Frederick James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303018.1 | 20.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | GB19920009281 | 29.04.1992 Original published format: GB 9209281 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0568234 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568234 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65B61/20, B65G47/91 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
B65G47/91 (EP,US);
B65B61/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Einbringen eines Einsatzes in einen Behälter | [1993/44] | English: | Apparatus for, and a method of, placing an insert in a container | [1993/44] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour placer une pièce d'insertion dans un récipient | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.07.1996 | CH | 03.07.1996 | GR | 03.07.1996 | IT | 03.07.1996 | LI | 03.07.1996 | PT | 03.10.1996 | SE | 03.10.1996 | [2008/05] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 03.07.1996 | |
CH | 03.07.1996 | ||
GR | 03.07.1996 | ||
IT | 03.07.1996 | ||
LI | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 03.07.1996 | |
CH | 03.07.1996 | ||
IT | 03.07.1996 | ||
LI | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 03.07.1996 | |
CH | 03.07.1996 | ||
LI | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | AT | 03.07.1996 | |
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 03.07.1996 | |
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 03.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3938301 (REJSA JACK J, et al) |