EP0569189 - Organopolysiloxanes and methods for making [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshikawa, Yuji B-314, Shinpu Ryo, 1610, Nishikamiisobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Takarada, Mitsuhiro 279-6, Kenzaki-machi Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303315.1 | 28.04.1993 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | JP19920143226 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: JP 14322692 | [1993/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569189 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569189 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/38, C08G77/20 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08G77/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/45] | Title | German: | Organopolysiloxane und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1993/45] | English: | Organopolysiloxanes and methods for making | [1993/45] | French: | Organopolysiloxanes et procédés pour leur préparation | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 21.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3198766 (SIEGFRIED NITZSCHE, et al); | [A]EP0196169 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [A]EP0463522 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0484119 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |