EP0569204 - Method of making N-channel and P-channel junction field-effect transistors using a BiCMOS process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/45] | Method of making N-channel and P-channel junction field-effect transistors and CMOS transistors using a CMOS or bipolar/CMOS process | ||
[1998/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95052-8090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara, California 95052-8090 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merrill, Richard B. 258 Alta Vista Daly City, California 94014 / US | 02 /
Farrenkopf, Doug R. 2815 Steinhart Ct. Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Bowles, Sharon Margaret, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Bowles, Sharon Margaret, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303427.4 | 30.04.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | US19920880677 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: US 880677 | [1993/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0569204 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0569204 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569204 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/82, H01L27/06 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
H01L21/8249 (EP,US);
H01L29/70 (KR);
H01L27/0623 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/45] | H01L21/82, H01L27/085, H01L27/06 | ||
Former IPC [1993/45] | H01L21/82, H01L27/085 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-Kanal- und P-Kanal-Sperrschicht-Feldeffekttransistoren unter Verwendung eines BiCMOS-Verfahrens | [1998/39] | English: | Method of making N-channel and P-channel junction field-effect transistors using a BiCMOS process | [1998/39] | French: | Procédé de fabrication des transistors à effet de champ à jonction à canal N et à canal P avec un procédé BiCMOS | [1998/39] |
Former [1993/45] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-Kanal- und P-Kanal-Sperrschicht-Feldeffekttransistoren unter Verwendung eines CMOS- oder Bipolar/CMOS-Verfahrens | ||
Former [1993/45] | Method of making N-channel and P-channel junction field-effect transistors and CMOS transistors using a CMOS or bipolar/CMOS process | ||
Former [1993/45] | Procédé de fabrication des transistors à effet de champ à jonction à canal N et à canal P en mettant en oeuvre une technologie CMOS ou bipolaire/CMOS | Examination procedure | 01.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 29.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.09.1998 | IT | 23.09.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 23.09.1998 | |
Former [1999/36] | FR | 19.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4403395 (CURRAN PATRICK A [US]) [X] 1-19 * abstract *; | [X]DE2753704 (HOEFFLINGER BERND PROF DR RER) [X] 1-19 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]JPS6185855 ; | [A]US4412238 (KHADDER WADIE N [US], et al) [A] 4,5,12-16 * abstract *; | [A]JPS60258948 ; | [A]JPS63292666 ; | [A]EP0267882 (SGS MICROELETTRONICA SPA [IT]) [A] 9,15,16 * abstract *; | [A]JPS6064475 | [X] - W.J.PODMIOTKO ET A.BAKOWSKI, "A MIXED CMOS-DMOS-JFET TECHNOLOGY FOR SWITCHING CIRCUITS WITH HIGH VOLTAGE OUTPUT STAGES", MICROELECTRONICS AND RELIABILITY, OXFORD GB, (1987), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 33 - 37, XP001625720 [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860904), vol. 10, no. 259, Database accession no. (E - 434)<2315>, & JP61085855 A 19860501 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860514), vol. 10, no. 129, Database accession no. (E - 403), & JP60258948 A 19851220 (CLARION K.K.) [A] 9,10,15,16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890327), vol. 13, no. 123, Database accession no. (E - 733)<3471>, & JP63292666 A 19881129 (NEC CORP) [A] 9,15,16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850814), vol. 9, no. 197, Database accession no. (E - 335), & JP60064475 A 19850413 (FUJITSU K.K) [A] 10 * abstract * |