EP0568392 - Assembly structure and assembling method of flat type display device and apparatus and method for supplying and curing resin therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawaguchi, Hisao 546-95, Shikishima-cho 2-chome Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakabu, Shigeo 5-1-209, Sanjo Sakae-machi Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Tagusa, Yasunobu 1420-2-205, Midorigaoka Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303435.7 | 30.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | JP19920111036 | 30.04.1992 Original published format: JP 11103692 | JP19920278510 | 16.10.1992 Original published format: JP 27851092 | JP19920349459 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34945992 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0568392 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0568392 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568392 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/32, G02F1/13, H05K1/00, H01L21/56 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
G02F1/13452 (EP,KR,US);
B29C33/06 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/147 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/305 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/361 (EP,KR,US);
H05K2201/10681 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/32] | H05K3/32, G02F1/13, H05K1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1993/44] | H05K3/32, G02F1/13 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/44] | Title | German: | Zusammenbaustruktur und Verfahren für eine flache Anzeigevorrichtung und geeignete Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Zuführen und Aushärten von Harz | [1993/44] | English: | Assembly structure and assembling method of flat type display device and apparatus and method for supplying and curing resin therefor | [1993/44] | French: | Dispositif et méthode d'assemblage pour un affichage à écran plat et dispositif et méthodes appropriés pour fournir et durcir de la résine | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.08.2002 | NL | 28.08.2002 | DE | 29.11.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/45] | NL | 28.08.2002 | |
DE | 29.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | NL | 28.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6480931 ; | [A]JPH0274092 ; | [A]JPH0467126 ; | [Y]JPH03166 ; | [A]JPS6398435 ; | [A]JPH03294592 ; | [PX]JPH04163926 ; | [A]US4640581 (NAKANOWATARI JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,6,10,12,29-31 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]EP0401746 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 32,41,42 * column 4, line 13 - line 38 * * column 5, line 11 - line 14; figures 2,3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890713), vol. 13, no. 306, Database accession no. (P - 897), & JP01080931 A 19890327 (OPTREX) [A] 1,3,10,23 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900531), vol. 14, no. 255, Database accession no. (E - 0935), & JP02074092 A 19900314 (SEIKO) [A] 1,3,4,6,10,23 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920616), vol. 16, no. 266, Database accession no. (P - 1371), & JP04067126 A 19920303 (SANYO) [A] 1,3,4,9,17-19 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910313), vol. 15, no. 104, Database accession no. (C - 0814), & JP03000166 A 19910107 (TOOTSUYA) [Y] 32,41,42 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880909), vol. 12, no. 336, Database accession no. (M - 736), & JP63098435 A 19880428 (FUJITSU) [A] 32,41 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920406), vol. 16, no. 133, Database accession no. (C - 0925), & JP03294592 A 19911225 (ICHIKAWA WOOLEN TEXTILE) [A] 32,35,41 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920925), vol. 16, no. 462, Database accession no. (E - 1269), & JP04163926 A 19920609 (NIPPON CHEMICON) [PX] 32,39,40,42 * abstract * |