EP0571165 - Improvements in and relating to binding perforated sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states James Burn International Limited Douglas Road Esher Surrey KT10 8BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states James Burn International Limited Douglas Road Esher Surrey KT10 8BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bagrosky, Frank 136 Mount Zion Road Marlboro, New York 12542 / US | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303804.4 | 17.05.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | GB19920010553 | 18.05.1992 Original published format: GB 9210553 | [1993/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571165 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571165 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B42B5/10 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
B42B5/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/28] |
Former [1993/47] | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Binden von gelochten Bögen | [1993/47] | English: | Improvements in and relating to binding perforated sheets | [1993/47] | French: | Reliure de feuilles perforées | [1993/47] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 07.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1996 | CH | 27.12.1996 | DK | 27.12.1996 | ES | 27.12.1996 | IT | 27.12.1996 | LI | 27.12.1996 | NL | 27.12.1996 | PT | 27.03.1997 | SE | 27.03.1997 | IE | 17.05.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
DK | 27.12.1996 | ||
ES | 27.12.1996 | ||
IT | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
NL | 27.12.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1997 | ||
SE | 27.03.1997 | ||
IE | 17.05.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
DK | 27.12.1996 | ||
ES | 27.12.1996 | ||
IT | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1997 | ||
SE | 27.03.1997 | ||
IE | 17.05.1997 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
DK | 27.12.1996 | ||
IT | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1997 | ||
SE | 27.03.1997 | ||
IE | 17.05.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
DK | 27.12.1996 | ||
IT | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1997 | ||
SE | 27.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
DK | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1997 | ||
SE | 27.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1997 | ||
SE | 27.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
PT | 27.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 27.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3903506 (SICKINGER CO [US]) |