28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
17.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
23.01.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] |
05.12.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] |
31.10.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] |
24.10.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] |
29.08.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] |
08.11.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] |
03.09.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.05.1996 |
Change - designated states |
published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] |
22.05.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.05.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.04.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.09.1995 |
First examination report |
|
07.06.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] |
08.10.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] |