Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0571165 | Global Dossier | 27.12.1996 | B1 | EP0571165 | 24.11.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9210553 | 18.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE146726T | 15.01.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9210553 | 18.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69306856T | 24.07.1997 | T2 | DE69306856D1 | 06.02.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9210553 | 18.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2267460 | 20.12.1995 | B | GB2267460 | 08.12.1993 | A | GB9310135D0 | 30.06.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9210553 | 18.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9210553D0 | 01.07.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9210553 | 18.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5370489 | 06.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9210553 | 18.05.1992 |