EP0581417 - Pattern forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takamura, Toru 550-5, Goubara Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Yoneyama, Tsutomu 5-5, Haraichi 3-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Tomaru, Kazuhiko 3308-11, Itahana Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303892.9 | 19.05.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | JP19920168482 | 03.06.1992 Original published format: JP 16848292 | [1994/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581417 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581417 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G09F21/02, B05C5/02 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
B05C5/0216 (EP,US);
B44F7/00 (KR);
D06Q1/00 (EP,US);
G09F21/02 (EP,US);
G09F21/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/05] | Title | German: | Musterherstellungsverfahren | [1994/05] | English: | Pattern forming method | [1994/05] | French: | Procédé de formation de motifs | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2054197 (FLOWMATIC SPECIAL MACHINES LTD); | [Y]EP0142257 (TENGS ANTHONY MARTIN); | [A]EP0470705 (CUBITAL LTD [IL]); | [A]US5049368 (TURNER JR HERMAN E [US]) | Examination | - DECLARATION - Results of comparative tests (TAKAMURA), 4.11.93, filed with letter of 20.3.96 and recieved on 25.3.96 |