EP0572209 - Process for preparing diprotected 2,3-hydroxymethyl cyclobutanol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc. Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton New Jersey 08543-4000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states E.R. SQUIBB & SONS, INC. Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton New Jersey 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Janak F13 Shirley Lane Lawrenceville, New Jersey / US | 02 /
Bisacchi, Gregory S. 12133 Taylor Court Lawrenceville, New Jersey / US | 03 /
Mueller, Richard H. 66 Lindbergh Road Ringoes, New Jersey / US | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1993/48] | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304032.1 | 25.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | US19920888077 | 26.05.1992 Original published format: US 888077 | [1993/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0572209 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0572209 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, C07C69/78, C07C67/29, C07C41/26, C07C43/178 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
C07F7/1892 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/29 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/29, C07C69/78 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/48] | C07F7/18, C07C69/78, C07C67/29 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von geschützten Hydroxylgruppen, enthaltend 2,3-Hydroxymethyl-Cyclobutanol | [1993/48] | English: | Process for preparing diprotected 2,3-hydroxymethyl cyclobutanol | [1993/48] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de 2,3-hydroxyméthyl cyclobutanol avec des groupements hydroxy protégés | [1993/48] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 19.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/22] | 10.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US433897 [ ] (E.R. SQUIBB & SONS); | [DA]EP0358154 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [DA] 1* page 12, line 1 - line 11 *; | [DA]EP0433897 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [DA] 1 * page 6, line 35 - line 44; example 1i * | [A] - FIESER L F ET AL, REAGENTS FOR ORGANIC SYNTHESIS VOL. 2, NEW YORK,US, WILEY, (1972) [A] 1 * page 228, paragraph 3 * | [A] - FIESER LF ET AL, REAGENTS FOR ORGANIC SYNTHESIS VOL.9, NEW YORK,US, WILEY, (1981) [A] 1 * page 486, paragraph 2 * | [A] - FIESER L F ET AL, REAGENTS IN ORGANIC SYNTHESIS VOL.6, NEW YORK,US, WILEY, (1977) [A] 1 * page 307, paragraph 2 * |