EP0572216 - Method for recording a plurality of kinds of data on recording medium and for reproducing the recorded data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Hirokazu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha Kosugi-Jigyosho 53, Imaikami-cho, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsuchiya, Keiji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha Kosugi-Jigyosho 53, Imaikami-cho, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304039.6 | 25.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | JP19920158892 | 27.05.1992 Original published format: JP 15889292 | [1993/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0572216 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0572216 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572216 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B27/32, G11B7/00, G11B20/10 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
G11B7/00745 (EP,US);
G11B20/1215 (EP,US);
G11B27/327 (EP,US);
G11B7/0033 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10916 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/48] | G11B20/12, G11B27/32, G11B20/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufzeichnung von mehreren Datensorten auf einem Aufzeichnungsmedium und zur Wiedergabe der aufgezeichneten Daten | [1993/48] | English: | Method for recording a plurality of kinds of data on recording medium and for reproducing the recorded data | [1993/48] | French: | Procédé pour enregistrer plusieurs types de données sur un support d'enregistrement et pour reproduire les données enregistrées | [1993/48] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Request for further processing for: | 05.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.01.1999 | NL | 07.01.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 07.01.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0251666 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 1 - line 4 * * column 8, line 24 - line 41 *; | [DA]EP0286308 (CANON KK [JP]) [DA] 1-14 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 26 *; | [A]EP0300457 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 43 - line 46 *; | [XA]EP0303377 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 15 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 25; figure 1 *[A] 9-14; | [X]EP0355620 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 9-15 * column 2, line 10 - line 15 * * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 11 *; | [XA]EP0461831 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 15 * page 3, line 19 - line 22; figure 1 * [A] 9-14; | [A]EP0469931 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 9, line 7 - column 10, line 27 * * column 11, line 35 - column 12, line 1 * |