EP0573215 - Vocoder synchronization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderton, David O. 10210 Julian Street Westminster, Colorado 80030 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1993/49] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) LTD. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304125.3 | 27.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19920893294 | 04.06.1992 Original published format: US 893294 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0573215 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0573215 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G10L9/14, H04B1/66 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
G10L19/005 (EP);
G10L19/038 (EP);
G10L19/12 (EP);
H04L7/043 (EP);
G10L19/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/49] | G10L9/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/49] | Title | German: | Vocodersynchronisierung | [1993/49] | English: | Vocoder synchronization | [1993/49] | French: | Synchronisation de vocodeurs | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 29.03.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA1220282 (NORTHERN TELECOM) [A] 1 * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 5; claims 5,10 * | [A] - STANSFIELD ET AL, "Speech processing techniques for HF radio security", IEE PROCEEDINGS I. COMMUNICATIONS SPEECH AND VISION, STEVENAGE GB, (198902), vol. 136, no. 1, pages 25 - 46, XP000212327 [A] 1 * page 36, section 4.5 * | [A] - REILLY, "A hybridized linear prediction code speech synthesizer", IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, MONTEREY CALIFORNIA USA, (19861005), vol. 2, pages 32.5.1 - 32.5.5, XP031444657 [A] 1 * pages 32.5.1-2, " synchronization requirements " ; pages 32.5.4-5, Appendix A * | [A] - DELOMO, HOYT, "Critical point coding: design and real time implementation at 16 kb/s", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, TAMPA FLORIDA USA, (19850326), vol. 4, pages 1692 - 1695 [A] 1 * page 1693, " Framing and synchronization " * | [A] - TANAKA ET AL, "A 16 kbs APC codec using digital signal processors", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, SAN DIEGO CALIFORNIA, (19840319), vol. 2, pages 27.11.1 - 27.11.4 [A] 1 * page 27.4.2, " Frame synchronization " * |