blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0573241

EP0573241 - Semiconductor devices with a double layered silicide structure and process of making it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
Former [1993/49]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-3 Dong, Paldal-ku
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-373 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Paek, Su-Hyon
Kaenari APT. 34-302, Yeoksam 2-dong
Kangnam-gu, Seoul / KR
02 / Choi, Jin-Seog
Samsung 1cha APT, 3-909, Maetan 2-dong
Paldal-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
[1993/49]
Representative(s)Stanley, David William, et al
DIBB LUPTON BROOMHEAD
117 The Headrow
Leeds
LS1 5JX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/45]Stanley, David William, et al
DIBB LUPTON BROOMHEAD
117 The Headrow, Leeds LS1 5JX / GB
Former [1993/49]Stanley, David William
APPLEYARD LEES & CO. 15 Clare Road Halifax
West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date93304216.001.06.1993
[1993/49]
Priority number, dateKR1994000149230.05.1992         Original published format: KR 941492
[1993/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0573241
Date:08.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0573241
Date:16.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0573241
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/768, H01L23/485, H01L21/3205
[1999/23]
CPC:
H01L23/53271 (EP,US); H01L21/324 (KR); H01L21/76889 (EP,US);
H01L23/532 (EP,US); H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
C-Set:
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1994/07]H01L21/90, H01L23/485, H01L21/3205
Former IPC [1993/49]H01L21/90, H01L23/485
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [1993/49]
TitleGerman:Halbleitervorrichtungen mit einer doppelschichtigen Silizidstruktur und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[1993/49]
English:Semiconductor devices with a double layered silicide structure and process of making it[1993/49]
French:Dispositifs semi-conducteurs comportant une structure à double couche de siliciure et leur procédé de fabrication[1993/49]
Examination procedure29.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/39]
16.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.07.199604   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.1996
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0295367  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-3,12 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 11 * * claims 1-3 *
 [A]  - K.W.CHOI ET AL., "IMPROVED SALICIDE PROCESS WITH MULTILAYER SILICIDE FORMATION", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198412), vol. 27, no. 7B, pages 4402 - 4404 [A] 1-5,7,12 * page 4403, paragraph 2 * * figure 4B *
 [A]  - "UNDERLAYER FIR POLYCIDE PROCESS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198602), vol. 28, no. 9, pages 3968 - 3969
 [A]  - "IMPROVED TISI2 FILMS FOR VLSI TECHNOLOGY", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, HAVANT GB, (199103), vol. 323, page 208
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.