EP0588467 - Threaded fastener for mounting within an opening in a panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS, INC. 11525, South Shoemaker Road Santa Fe Springs California 90670 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS, INC. 11525, South Shoemaker Road Santa Fe Springs California 90670 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitts, Richard K. 300 Cienaga Drive Fullerton California 92625 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Brereton, Paul Arthur Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Brereton, Paul Arthur REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304369.7 | 04.06.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | US19920946650 | 18.09.1992 Original published format: US 946650 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588467 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588467 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
F16B37/043 (EP,US);
Y10S411/913 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | In eine Wandöffnung einer Platte einsetzbares Schraubverbindungselement | [1994/12] | English: | Threaded fastener for mounting within an opening in a panel | [1994/12] | French: | Ecrou destiné à être fixé dans une ouverture d'une plaque | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 29.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.12.1996 | SE | 27.03.1997 | [1998/11] |
Former [1997/40] | BE | 27.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2499177 (ITW DE FRANCE [FR]); | [A]US3164191 (GRIMM DAVID W, et al); | [A]DE3728070 (NIFCO INC [JP]); | [A]US2571394 (TRAFTON WARREN L); | [A]US3645311 (TINNERMAN GEORGE A); | [A]US4300865 (MURRAY RONALD A); | [E]FR2687439 (RAPID SA [FR]) |