EP0576184 - Surface modified blood collection tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogler, Erwin A. 120 Route 1, Beaver Creek Road Newhill, North Carolina 27562 / US | 02 /
Harper, Garry R. 5042-C Edwards Mill Road Raleigh, North Carolina 27612 / US | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304608.8 | 14.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | US19920903111 | 23.06.1992 Original published format: US 903111 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0576184 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0576184 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576184 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/14, G01N33/49 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
B01L3/5082 (EP,US);
G01N33/4905 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/52] | B01L3/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/52] | Title | German: | Oberflächenmodifizierte Blutentnahmeröhrchen | [1993/52] | English: | Surface modified blood collection tubes | [1993/52] | French: | Tubes de prélèvement de sang à surface modifiée | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4257886 (KESSLER STEPHEN B) [X] 1-6 * column W * [Y] 7-10; | [DY]US4967763 (NUGENT EDWARD [US], et al) [DY] 7-10 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 35 ** column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 39 * |