EP0576195 - Nuclear reactor reflector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hopkins, Ronald Jacobs 8270 Strasbourg Road Pensacola, FL 32514 / US | 02 /
Misvel, Michael C. 4572 Whisper Circle Pensacola, FL 32504 / US | 03 /
Land, John Thomas 4020 Belvedere Drive Pensacola, FL 32514 / US | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304674.0 | 16.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | US19920903634 | 24.06.1992 Original published format: US 903634 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576195 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576195 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G21C11/06 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
G21C11/06 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/52] | Title | German: | Kernreaktorreflektor | [1993/52] | English: | Nuclear reactor reflector | [1993/52] | French: | Reflecteur de réacteur nucléaire | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 18.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0488890 (FRAMATOME SA [FR]); | [Y]EP0323306 (FRAMATOME SA [FR]); | [A]EP0367963 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [AD]US4849162 (GARNER DANIEL C [US], et al); | [AD]EP0117168 (FRAMATOME & CIE [FR]) |