EP0575157 - Method of manufacturing silica waveguide optical components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Green, Mino 55 Gerard Road London SW13 9QH / GB | 02 /
Syms, R. R. A. 22 Hollies Road Ealing, London W5 / GB | 03 /
Holmes, Sean Andrew 25 Kingscourt Road London SW16 1JA / GB | 04 /
Ueki, Ken, c/o The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Yanagawa, Hisaharu, c/o The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Calamita, Roberto Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | Calamita, Roberto Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304681.5 | 16.06.1993 | [1993/51] | Priority number, date | JP19920156598 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15659892 | [1993/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575157 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575157 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
C03C1/006 (EP,US);
G02B6/132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung optischer Siliciumdioxid-Wellenleiterkomponente | [1993/51] | English: | Method of manufacturing silica waveguide optical components | [1993/51] | French: | Méthode de fabrication des composantes optiques de guide d'onde en silice | [1993/51] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Request for further processing for: | 25.11.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 25.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.04.1999 | [2004/35] |
Former [2000/24] | FR | 17.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1129206 ; | [AP]JPH04147201 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) | [A] - DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 8926, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class L03, AN 89-189617 & JP-A-1 129 206 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) 22 May 1989, & JP1129206 A 19890522 |