EP0576217 - Ultrasound bone analyser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McCue PLC 190 Strand London WC2R 1JN / GB | [1997/28] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states MCCUE ULTRASONICS Ltd. Parsonage Barn, Compton Winchester, Hampshire, SO21 2AS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langton, Christian McDonald 157 Thorne Road Doncaster DN2 5BH / GB | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Linn, Samuel Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Linn, Samuel Jonathan, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304781.3 | 18.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | GB19920013220 | 22.06.1992 Original published format: GB 9213220 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576217 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576217 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0576217 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/00 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
A61B8/4281 (EP,US);
A61B8/0875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | Ultraschall-Gerät zur Knochen-Anlage | [1993/52] | English: | Ultrasound bone analyser | [1993/52] | French: | Dispositif à ultrasons pour l'analyse des os | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 02.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.1999
WITHDRAWN Aloka Co., Ltd. Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181 / JP Opponent's representative Solf, Alexander Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.1999
WITHDRAWN Aloka Co., Ltd. Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181 / JP Opponent's representative Solf, Alexander, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | 16.08.1999 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 08.10.1999 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 25.10.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.04.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 22.05.2000 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3847141 (HOOP J); | [A]DE2925933 (PICKER CORP); | [X]WO9001903 (OSTEO TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [Y]US5014970 (OSIPOV VLADIMIR W [US]); | [XP]US5134999 (OSIPOV VLADIMIR W [US]) | Examination | EP0516353 |