EP0576220 - Bar-code reader device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Katsushi 37-8, Katsura Hitsujisarucho, Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | 02 /
Tamai, Seiichiro 18-14, Kofudai-6-chome, Toyonocho Toyono-gun, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Keiichi 10-40-301, Shimorokumanjicho-1-chome Higashiosaka-shi / JP | 04 /
Dosho (née Tashiro), Marie 3-305, Myokenzaka-6-chome Katano-shi / JP | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1993/52] | Application number, filing date | 93304784.7 | 18.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | JP19920161543 | 22.06.1992 Original published format: JP 16154392 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0576220 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0576220 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576220 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
G06K7/1093 (EP,US);
G06K7/1417 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/52] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Lesen von Strichkoden | [1993/52] | English: | Bar-code reader device | [1993/52] | French: | Dispositif lecteur de codes à barres | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0384955 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 9, line 45 - column 16, line 24 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0273554 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1 | Examination | EP0385478 | WO9318478 |