EP0580292 - Cluster mills with additional profile control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/04] | Additional profile control for cluster mills | ||
[1997/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T. SENDZIMIR, INC. 269 Brookside Road Waterbury Connecticut 06721 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states T. SENDZIMIR, INC. 269 Brookside Road Waterbury, Connecticut 06721 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sandzimir, Michael G. East Hill Road Woodbury, CT 06798 County of Litchfield / US | 02 /
Turley, John W. 14 Pine Street Oxford, CT 06478 County of New Haven / US | 03 /
Datzuk, Alexander 2878 Noth Main Street Waterbury, CT 06704 County of New Haven / US | [1994/04] | Representative(s) | Clifford, Frederick Alan MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [1994/04] | Application number, filing date | 93304826.6 | 21.06.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | US19920916909 | 20.07.1992 Original published format: US 916909 | [1994/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580292 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580292 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/14, B21B31/00 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
B21B13/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/04] | Title | German: | Vielwalzengerüste mit zusätzlicher Profilkontrolle | [1997/37] | English: | Cluster mills with additional profile control | [1997/37] | French: | Laminoirs à plusieurs cylindres avec contrôle d'addition de profil | [1997/37] |
Former [1994/04] | Zusätzliche Profilkontrolle für Vielwalzengerüste | ||
Former [1994/04] | Additional profile control for cluster mills | ||
Former [1994/04] | Contrôle d'addition de profil pour laminoirs à plusieurs cylindres | Examination procedure | 18.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.09.1997 | DE | 11.12.1997 | [1999/42] |
Former [1998/30] | DE | 11.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4289013 (HUNKE SIEGFRIED H); | [AD]US3815401 (SENDZIMIR T, et al); | [AD]US2776586 (TADEUSZ SENDZIMIR); | [A]US2479974 (TADEUSZ SENDZIMIR, et al); | [AD]US2169711 (TADEUSZ SENDZIMIR); | [A]DE1427998 (ACCUROLL S A); | [A]EP0476905 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]CH286576 (SENDZIMIR TADEUSZ [US]) |