EP0577387 - Separator for electrochemical cell and method of preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN GORE-TEX, INC. 42-5, 1-chome Akazutsumi Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states JAPAN GORE-TEX, INC. 42-5, 1-chome Akazutsumi Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mushiake, Naofumi 102, Kanemoto Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken 703 / JP | 02 /
Wani, Takayuki 102, Kanemoto Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken 703 / JP | 03 /
Kato, Hiroshi 508-18, Seki Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken 703 / JP | 04 /
Sagara, Takeshi 12-23, Nishifurumatsu 2-chome Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken 700 / JP | 05 /
Sasaki, Fumihiro 848-1, Minamigata, Yoshinaga-cho Wake-gun, Okayama-ken 709-02 / JP | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | McCallum, William Potter, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | McCallum, William Potter, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305074.2 | 29.06.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | JP19920194884 | 29.06.1992 Original published format: JP 19488492 | JP19930051549 | 17.02.1993 Original published format: JP 5154993 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577387 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
H01M50/417 (EP,US);
H01M50/426 (EP,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10T428/249981 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31544 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/01] | Title | German: | Separator für elektrochemische Zelle und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1999/09] | English: | Separator for electrochemical cell and method of preparation | [1994/01] | French: | Séparateur pour cellule électrochimique et procédé de fabrication | [1994/01] |
Former [1994/01] | Separator für elektrochimische Zelle und Verfahren zur Herstellung | Examination procedure | 14.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 10.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/17] | 07.02.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP04126353 ; | [X]EP0201875 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 389 (E-1250)19 August 1990 & JP-A-04 126353 ( NITTO DENKO ), & JP04126353 A 19900819 |