EP0581446 - Method for the treatment of mechanical pulps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metsä-Serla Oy Fabianinkatu 8 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states Metsä-Serla Oy Fabianinkatu 8 A SF-00130 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thornton, Jeffrey Varnankatu 4 G 88 F-20320 Turku / FI | 02 /
Ekman, Rainer Pertunkatu 3 A 17 F-20720 Turku / FI | 03 /
Holmbom, Bjarne Tarkk'Ampujankatu 14 F-20540 Turku / FI | 04 /
Eckerman, Christer Itäharjunkatu 12 F-20540 Turku / FI | 05 /
Tenkanen, Mija Keskilaaksontie 3 C F-02360 Espoo / FI | 06 /
Viikari, Liisa Lokkikuja 5 F-00200 Helsinki / FI | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1994/05] | Collier, Jeremy Austin Grey, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305124.5 | 30.06.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | FI19920003269 | 17.07.1992 Original published format: FI 923269 | [1994/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581446 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581446 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/00, C12S3/00 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
C12P19/04 (EP,US);
D21C5/005 (EP,US);
D21C9/005 (EP,US);
Y10S435/913 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Holzschliffen | [1994/05] | English: | Method for the treatment of mechanical pulps | [1994/05] | French: | Procédé de traitement de pâtes mécaniques | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 19.03.1997 | DK | 19.03.1997 | GR | 19.03.1997 | LI | 19.03.1997 | IE | 30.06.1997 | LU | 30.06.1997 | [2001/01] |
Former [2000/05] | CH | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
LI | 19.03.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | CH | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
LI | 19.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 19.03.1997 | |
LI | 19.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1209440 (SADLER ET AL.) [A] 1-3,8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0430915 (ENSO GUTZEIT OY [FI]) [A] 1,5-7,10* the whole document * | [DX] - Holmbom, B. et al, "Chemical Changes in Peroxide Bleaching of Mechanical Pulps", PAPIER 45, NO. 10A: V16-22 (OCT. 1991). [ENGL.;GER. SUM.] [DX] 1-3,10 * paragraph [0002] * | [DX] - Thornton, J. et al, "Effects of Peroxide Bleaching of [Norway] Spruce [Picea abies] TMP on Dissolved and Colloidal Organic Substances", PAPERCHEM, THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ATLANTA, GA, US [DX] 1-3,10 * abstract * | [ ] - APPITA 6TH INT. SYMP. ON WOOD & PULPING CHEM. PROC. (MELBOURNE) VOL. 1: 571-577 (1991). [ENGL.] [ ] * page 575; table 2 * |