Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0579442
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
08.08.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] |
08.08.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] |
16.08.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] |
16.07.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.04.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.01.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.06.1995 |
First examination report |
|
20.07.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] |
03.12.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] |