Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0579442 | Global Dossier | 02.10.1996 | B1 | EP0579442 | 19.01.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9215038 | 15.07.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2269450 | 05.06.1996 | B | GB2269450 | 09.02.1994 | A | GB9215038D0 | 26.08.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9215038 | 15.07.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5376044 | 27.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9215038 | 15.07.1992 |