EP0579442 - Ventilator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARDWARE & SYSTEMS PATENTS LIMITED 100 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BN / GB | [1994/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tippin, Arthur David 24 Heaton Drive Birmingham B15 3LW / GB | 02 /
Fletcher, Tracy Dain 14 Derwent Close Willenhall, West Midlands WV13 1HN / GB | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Knowles, Audrey Elizabeth 624 Pershore Road Selly Park Birmingham B29 7HG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | Knowles, Audrey Elizabeth 624 Pershore Road Selly Park Birmingham B29 7HG / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305315.9 | 07.07.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | GB19920015038 | 15.07.1992 Original published format: GB 9215038 | [1994/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0579442 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579442 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/18 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
F24F13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DK, GB, IE, NL, SE [1994/03] | Title | German: | Lüftung | [1994/03] | English: | Ventilator | [1994/03] | French: | Ventilateur | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/36] | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 02.10.1996 | NL | 02.10.1996 | SE | 02.01.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 02.10.1996 | |
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | SE | 02.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1250092 ; | [X]GB2136106 (GREENWOOD AIRVAC VENTILATION); | [A]US2804008 (KOCH GUSTAV H) |