EP0579448 - Seal apparatus and method for forming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sogge, Dale R. 70 Desert Brook Road Wrentham, MA 02093 / US | 02 /
Werner, Karl H. 25 Kostka Drive No. Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1994/03] | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305339.9 | 07.07.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | US19920913510 | 14.07.1992 Original published format: US 913510 | [1994/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0579448 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579448 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/02, H01H35/34 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
F16J15/106 (EP,US);
H01H35/24 (KR);
H01H35/34 (EP,US);
Y10S277/91 (EP,US);
Y10S277/925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/03] | Title | German: | Dichtungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1994/03] | English: | Seal apparatus and method for forming | [1994/03] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité ainsi que méthode de formation | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0434329 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [YP]FR2681396 (FREUDENBERG [FR]); | [AD]EP0458494 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [A]EP0403674 (VFP CORP [US]); | [A]GB1243856 (TRIST MOULDINGS & SEALS LTD) |