Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
15.03.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
12.08.1994 | First examination report | |
14.07.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] |
23.12.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.02.1994 [1994/06] |