EP0582390 - Dual mode phase-locked loop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY County of Wayne Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [1994/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuo, Yao Hsien 13 St. Andrews Place Brentwood, Essex CM15 8HH / GB | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305442.1 | 12.07.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | US19920924808 | 04.08.1992 Original published format: US 924808 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582390 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582390 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/107, H03L7/18 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
H03L7/0893 (EP,US);
H03L7/1075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/06] | Title | German: | Phasenregelkreis mit zwei Betriebsorten | [1994/06] | English: | Dual mode phase-locked loop | [1994/06] | French: | Boucle à verrouillage de phase à double mode de fonctionnement | [1994/06] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 18.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3719896 (HOLISTEIN C, et al); | [A]US4280104 (RZESZEWSKI THEODORE S); | [Y]US4745372 (MIWA MAKOTO [JP]); | [A]EP0371790 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) |