EP0582398 - Snapless, tabless, disposable medical electrode with low profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAPHIC CONTROLS CORPORATION 189 Van Rensselaer Street Buffalo New York 14240 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states GRAPHIC CONTROLS CORPORATION 189 Van Rensselaer Street Buffalo, New York 14240 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Disabito, David M: 4617 Pine Manor Clarence, New York 14031 / US | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305675.6 | 19.07.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | US19920916545 | 20.07.1992 Original published format: US 916545 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582398 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582398 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0408 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
A61B5/25 (EP,US);
A61B2562/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/06] | Title | German: | Medizinische Wegwerf-Flachprofilelektrode | [1994/06] | English: | Snapless, tabless, disposable medical electrode with low profile | [1994/06] | French: | Electrode médicale jetable à profil bas | [1994/06] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 24.05.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4635642 (CARTMELL JAMES V [US], et al) [A] 1-6,12,16-21 * column 3, line 28 - column 6, line 43 * * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 57 * * figures 1-3,5-8 *; | [A]EP0210020 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]) [A] 1-4,6,7,9,12,16-20 * page 6, line 24 - page 16, line 12 ** figure - *; | [XA]US4653503 (HEATH ROGER L [US]) [X] 1,16,19 * column 4, line 66 - column 8, line 58 * * figure - * [A] 2-7,12,15,17,18,20,21 | Examination | - McGraw-Hill DICTIONARY OF SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL TERMS (third edition - 1984), p. 1698 |