EP0580442 - Integrated magnetic read/write head/flexure/conductor structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENSTOR CORPORATION 530 Race Street San Jose California 95126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states CENSTOR CORPORATION 530 Race Street San Jose California 95126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamilton, Harold J. 2613 Tuliptree Lane Santa Clara California 95051 / US | [1994/04] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305811.7 | 22.07.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | US19920919302 | 23.07.1992 Original published format: US 919302 | [1994/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0580442 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0580442 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/48, G11B5/31, G11B5/33, G11B5/39 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
G11B5/1278 (EP);
G11B5/3103 (EP);
G11B5/484 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/04] | Title | German: | Integrierte Struktur mit Lese-/Schreibemagnetkopf, Biegung und Leiter | [1994/04] | English: | Integrated magnetic read/write head/flexure/conductor structure | [1994/04] | French: | Structure intégrée de tête magnétique de lecture/écriture, d'élément de flexion et de conducteurs | [1994/04] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/36] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/31] | 03.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0430407 (CENSTOR CORPORATION) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,6; | [YD]US4751598 (H.J. HAMILTON) [YD] 2,5 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - line 56 * * column 6, line 52 - column 8, line 33 * * column 11, line 39 - line 61 *; | [Y]EP0179653 (SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [Y] 3,6 * page 6, line 7 - line 19 * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 20 * * page 10, line 7 - page 12, line 10 * * figures 4,7 *; | [A]GB2064200 (N.V. PHILIPS GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP0540282 (CENSTOR CORP.) [XP] 1-6 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 48 * * column 9, line 36 - line 47 * * column 13, line 18 - column 14, line 16 * * figures 4,7,8; claims 8-10,15-17 *; | [XP]EP0508565 (CENSTOR CORP.) [XP] 1 * column 2, line 32 - line 55 * * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 36 * * column 12, line 29 - column 13, line 22 * * column 13, line 44 - column 14, line 29 * * claims 1,10,11 * * figures 5A,5B,11B,12 *; | [XP]EP0517980 (CENSTOR CORP.) [XP] 1,4 * the whole document * | [X] - H. HAMILTON ET AL., "CONTACT PERPENDICULAR RECORDING ON RIGID MEDIA", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS., NEW YORK US, (199111), vol. 27, no. 6,P2, doi:doi:10.1109/20.278699, pages 4921 - 4926, XP000568007 [X] 1,4 * page 4922, column L, line 49 - page 4923, column R, line 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.278699 |