EP0581543 - Photographic film processor with two film transport speeds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | For:DE
FR
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | |||
Former [1995/01] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | |||
Former [1994/05] | For:GB
Kodak Limited Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pummell, Leslie James Horace 44 Highfield Way Rickmansworth, Herts WD3 2PR / GB | 02 /
Ward, Paul Courtenay 18 Meadow Bank Watford WD1 4NP / GB | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305840.6 | 23.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | GB19920015957 | 27.07.1992 Original published format: GB 9215957 | [1994/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581543 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581543 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03D3/13 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
G03D3/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/28] |
Former [1994/05] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Photographisches Entwicklungsgerät mit zwei Filmbeförderungsgeschwindigkeiten | [1994/05] | English: | Photographic film processor with two film transport speeds | [1994/05] | French: | Appareil de développement photographique avec dispositif de transport du film à deux vitesses | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2706913 (BASF AG) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE3833733 (AGFA-GEVAERT AG) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]WO9008981 (KODAK LIMITED) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * * page 13, line 34 - page 14, line 2 *; | [A]US4300828 (K.M. KAUFMANN) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4673251 (B.H. SANNEL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 17 * * figures 2,3 * |