EP0582447 - Nuclear fuel pellet retainer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johansson, Eric Bertil 2400 North Lumina Avenue Wrightsville Beach, North Carolina 28480 / US | 02 /
King, Harold Bleckley 10 Island Drive Wrightsville Beach, North Carolina 28480 / US | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Lupton, Frederick, et al LONDON PATENT OPERATION G.E. TECHNICAL SERVICES Co. INC. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Lupton, Frederick, et al LONDON PATENT OPERATION, G.E. TECHNICAL SERVICES Co. INC., Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306080.8 | 02.08.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | US19920924805 | 04.08.1992 Original published format: US 924805 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582447 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/18 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
G21C3/18 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI, SE [1994/06] | Title | German: | Kernbrennstofftablettenhalter | [1994/06] | English: | Nuclear fuel pellet retainer | [1994/06] | French: | Dispositif de retenue de pastilles de combustible nucléaire | [1994/06] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/14] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/14] | Request for further processing for: | 22.03.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1614308 (NUKEM GMBH); | [X]FR2100548 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [Y]EP0064139 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [X]EP0225032 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]); | [A]FR2608727 (SOURIAU & CIE [FR]); | [AD]EP0340563 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |