EP0581617 - Electronic prostal scale with variable feed belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Debarber, Christopher 31 McVeigh Road Woodbury, Connecticut 06798 / US | 02 /
Freeman, Gerald C. 185 W. Norwalk Road Norwalk, Connecticut 06850 / US | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1994/05] | Application number, filing date | 93306112.9 | 02.08.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | US19920923407 | 31.07.1992 Original published format: US 923407 | [1994/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581617 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/00, G07B17/00 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
G01G19/005 (EP,US);
G07B17/00467 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00701 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1994/05] | Title | German: | Elektronische Postwaage mit variablem Förderband | [1994/05] | English: | Electronic prostal scale with variable feed belt | [1994/05] | French: | Balance postale électronique avec convoyeur à courroie variable | [1994/05] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 01.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/36] | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2217310 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]); | [A]DE9202676U ; | [A]FR2387879 (MASYC AG [CH]); | [A]FR2310553 (AUTOMATISME CIE GLE [FR]) |