EP0583927 - Dynamically adaptive equalizer system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANFORD TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC 1221 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale California 94088 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states STANFORD TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC 1221 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94088 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Currivan, Bruce J. 965 Leonello Avenue Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 02 /
Ohlson, John E. 750 Sylvan Avenue, No.26 Mt. View, California 94041 / US | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Jones, Graham H. Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306278.8 | 09.08.1993 | [1994/08] | Priority number, date | US19920926669 | 10.08.1992 Original published format: US 926669 | [1994/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583927 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0583927 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04B3/04, H03H21/00 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
H03H21/0012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/08] | Title | German: | Dynamisches adaptives Entzerrersystem und Verfahren hierfür | [1994/08] | English: | Dynamically adaptive equalizer system and method | [1994/08] | French: | Système d'equilibreur dynamiquement adaptable et méthode | [1994/08] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 09.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.03.1999 | SE | 10.03.1999 | DE | 11.06.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 10.03.1999 | |
DE | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/20] | DE | 11.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4550415 (DEBUS JR WALTER [US], et al); | [A]US4524424 (WHITE STANLEY A [US]); | [A]US5119401 (TSUJIMOTO ICHIRO [JP]) |