EP0638880 - A method of verifying fake-proof video identification data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audio DigitalImaging, Inc. 511 West Golf Road Arlington Heights, IL 60005 / US | [1995/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monroe, Midori Jean c/o Audio Digitalimaging, Inc. 511 West Golf Road Arlington Heights, IL 60005 / US | 02 /
Huang, George Yanming 944 Shore Court Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | 03 /
Martin, Tony Dale 919 E. Golf Road Arlington Heights, IL 60005 / US | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS BARKER Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306311.7 | 10.08.1993 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638880 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638880 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G07C9/00 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/40145 (EP);
G06Q20/4097 (EP);
G06V40/70 (EP,US);
G07C9/253 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1995/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Echtheitsprüfung von fälschungssicheren Video-Identifizierungsdaten | [1995/07] | English: | A method of verifying fake-proof video identification data | [1995/07] | French: | Méthode pour la vérification de données vidéo d'identification infalsifiables | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3742451 (GRAHAM W, et al); | [A]EP0203543 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [YA]US4636622 (CLARK CLEMENT P [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column W * [A] 7,9-12; | [A]WO8900741 (ETC [US], et al); | [A]WO8908899 (DATACARD CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,6,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0397512 (SHINSOZAI SOGO KENKYUSHO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-12 * abstract *; | [DYA]US5214699 (MONROE MIDORI [CA], et al) [DY] 1-3 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 4, line 14 - line 15 * [A] 4-6 |