EP0601689 - Secondary ion mass spectrometric analysis of metals and method of preparing standard sample therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIRECTOR-GENERAL OF THE AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states DIRECTOR-GENERAL OF THE AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oishi, Shoji 817-7, Azuma 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Allam, Peter Clerk LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306400.8 | 13.08.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | JP19920351649 | 08.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35164992 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601689 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601689 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
G01N1/286 (EP);
G01N1/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/24] | Title | German: | Sekundärionen-massenspektrometrische Analyse von Metallen und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Probenstandards hierfür | [1994/24] | English: | Secondary ion mass spectrometric analysis of metals and method of preparing standard sample therefor | [1994/24] | French: | Analyse des métaux par spectrometrie de masse à ion secondaire et méthode de préparation d'un standard d'échantillon pour celle-ci | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 11.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5081352 (MAKLAE ET AL.) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]SU1101714 ; | [A]JPS59132344 ; | [A]JPS59132344 | [DA] - T. ISHIZUKA, "Secondary ion mass spectrometry of rare earth elements", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (197409), vol. 46, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1021/ac60347a019, pages 1487 - 1491, XP002000626 [DA] 1-3 * page 1487, column R, paragraph 3 - page 1488, column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac60347a019 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 05, Database accession no. 85-30609, & SU1101714 A 19840707 (AGRIC AGROCHEM SERV) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841205), vol. 8, no. 265, Database accession no. (P - 318), & JP59132344 A 19840730 (SUMITOMO) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 36, Database accession no. 84-222745, & JPS59132344 A 19840730 (SUMITOMO) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |