EP0586134 - Rivet setting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rössler, Andreas An Der Kirche 22 D-6301 Fernwald 1 / DE | 02 /
Waltenberg, Hans-Dieter Gregor-Mendel-Strasse 4 D-6301 Giessen-Klein-Linden / DE | 03 /
Tessarsch, Norbert Markwald 22 D-6301 Giessen-Klein-Linden / DE | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [1994/10] | Wetters, Basil David Peter, et al Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306469.3 | 17.08.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | GB19920018463 | 29.08.1992 Original published format: GB 9218463 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586134 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586134 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B21J15/04, B21J15/06 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
B21J15/043 (EP,US);
B21J15/10 (KR);
B21J15/105 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5373 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5377 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/10] | Title | German: | Nietwerkzeug | [1994/10] | English: | Rivet setting tool | [1994/10] | French: | Outil à poser des rivets | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 09.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Request for further processing for: | 18.03.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 06.10.1999 | [2002/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2384690 (MULLGARDT ALEXANDER S) [X] 1,5,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0468717 (EMHART INC [US]); | [A]GB2171947 (TUCKER FASTENERS LTD); | [A]US2400354 (JOHN JENSEN) |