Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0586134
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
04.08.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
20.08.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |
13.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
31.03.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
23.03.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
04.03.1999 |
Application refused |
|
18.12.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.02.1999 [1999/05] |
17.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.03.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.11.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.06.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.01.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.01.1997 |
First examination report |
|
25.07.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.04.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] |
21.01.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] |