EP0586159 - Precoding of signature sequences for CMDA systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weerackody, Vijitha 32B Troy Drive Springfield, New Jersey 07081 / US | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306640.9 | 20.08.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | US19920938072 | 31.08.1992 Original published format: US 938072 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0586159 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0586159 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586159 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/00, H04J4/00, H04J13/00 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
H04J11/0036 (EP,US);
H04B7/2628 (EP,US);
H04J13/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/10] | H04Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/10] | Title | German: | Vorkodierung von Zeichensequenzen bei CDMA-Systemen | [1994/10] | English: | Precoding of signature sequences for CMDA systems | [1994/10] | French: | Précodage de séquences de signes pour systèmes CDMA | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 01.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4460992 (GUTLEBER FRANK S [US]) [A] 1-11; | [A]US4561089 (ROUSE DONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1-11; | [A]EP0216974 (SANGAMO WESTON [US])[A] 1-11; | [A]EP0265178 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-11; | [A]US5099493 (ZEGER ANDREW E [US], et al) [A] 1-11; | [A]EP0493904 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-11 |