blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0641098

EP0641098 - Communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001Change - applicantpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [1995/09]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Morley, Stephen Hewlett-Packard Laboratories
Filton Road
Bristol, BS12 6QZ / GB
[1995/09]
Representative(s)Kilgannon, Denise Mary, et al
Hewlett-Packard Ltd, IP Section, Building 3, Filton Road
Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/09]Webster, Denise Mary, et al
Hewlett-Packard Ltd, IP Section, Building 2, Filton Road, Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS12 6QZ / GB
Application number, filing date93306797.726.08.1993
[1995/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0641098
Date:01.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0641098
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.1994
ClassificationIPC:H04J3/12, H04L25/05
[2000/12]
CPC:
H04J3/125 (EP,US); H04L25/05 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1995/09]H04J3/12, H04L25/36
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/09]
TitleGerman:Übertragungssystem[1995/09]
English:Communication system[1995/09]
French:Système de transmission[1995/09]
Examination procedure17.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/19]
04.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.1999Fee for grant paid
03.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0170413  (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,7,10 * page 2, line 1 - line 15 * * page 2, line 25 - page 6, line 16 *;
 [Y]WO9215159  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-8,10 * page 5, line 29 - page 9, line 10 *;
 [Y]JPH107738
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890427), vol. 01, no. 3181, Database accession no. (E - 750), & JP10007738 A 00000000 (K.D.D. CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,6-8,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - W.A. KAISER ET AL., "Digital two-wire local connection providing office subscribers with speech, data and new teleinformation services.", PROCEEDINGS IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUBSCRIBER LOOPS AND SERVICES., ATLANTA (US), (19780320), pages 126 - 130 [A] 1-10 * page 129, column 2, line 37 - page 130, column 1, line 18 *
 [A]  - J. BESSEYRE, "Self timing framing in a digital telephone system", I.B.M. TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19730101), vol. 15, no. 8, pages 2527 - 2528 [A] 1-10
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.