EP0586199 - Protective device for injection needle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew Inc. 11775 Starkey Road, Suite 100 Largo Florida 34643 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states SMITH & NEPHEW INC. 11775 Starkey Road, Suite 100 Largo, Florida 34643 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheuble, Gustav A. 1355 Carol Lane Des Plaines, Illinois 60018 / US | 02 /
Kohnke, Fritz 909 E Kenilworth Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | 03 /
Paczka, Guenter 1235 Mayfield Lane Hoffman Estates, Illinois 60195 / US | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1994/10] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Corporate Patents Department Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO1 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306798.5 | 26.08.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | US19920939057 | 02.09.1992 Original published format: US 939057 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586199 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
A61M5/3243 (EP);
A61M2005/3253 (EP);
A61M5/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/10] | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung für Injektionsnadel | [1994/10] | English: | Protective device for injection needle | [1994/10] | French: | Dispositif de protection pour aiguilles d'injection | [1994/10] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 15.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/10] | 26.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/47] | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4772272 (MCFARLAND) [XD] 1-3,6,10,11 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 12 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XAY]US5104385 (HUBAND) [X] 1,2,4,9,11 * column 2, line 65 - line 68 * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 61 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 13 [Y] 5,14; | [Y]US4581024 (SWENSON) [Y] 5,14 * column 4, line 36 - line 41 * * column 5, line 15 - line 60 * * figure 3 *; | [X]WO9004984 (COPLIN) [X] 1,3,7-11,13 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 19 * * page 13, line 7 - line 17 * * figures 2,7,9 *; | [X]EP0299287 (PONCY) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,11,12,15 * column 2, line 12 - column 4, line 38 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3406687 (MOYER) [A] 9,15 * column 3, line 7 - line 31 * * column 4, line 57 - line 70 * * figures 1-5 * |