EP0589573 - A float for a liquid level operated device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 50725 Köln / DE | |||
Former [1994/13] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shortis, Steven 2 Abbey Road Billericay, Essex CM12 9NF / GB | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306871.0 | 31.08.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | GB19920019838 | 19.09.1992 Original published format: GB 9219838 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0589573 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0589573 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589573 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/76 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
G01F23/36 (EP,US);
G01F23/32 (EP,US);
G01F23/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/13] | Title | German: | Schwimmer für eine durch den Füllstand betätigte Vorrichtung | [1994/13] | English: | A float for a liquid level operated device | [1994/13] | French: | Flotteur pour un dispositif actionné par le niveau d'un liquide | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.05.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/22] | FR | 16.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4627378 (MANNESS CECIL E [CA], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]US3012437 (CLARK JAMES A, et al) [A] 1,8 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2655729 (JAEGER [FR]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * |