EP0586244 - Method and apparatus for producing polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.1998 [1998/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramachandran, Ramakrishnan 232 Hillside Avenue Allendale, New Jersey 07401 / US | 02 /
Malik, Virginia 1633 Lenape Road Linden, New Jersey 07036 / US | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Wickham, Michael, et al c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306919.7 | 01.09.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | US19920939276 | 02.09.1992 Original published format: US 939276 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586244 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586244 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/00, C08F2/00 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
C08F6/001 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/00 (US,EP);
C08F6/001, C08L23/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Polymeren | [1994/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing polymers | [1994/10] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la fabrication de polymères | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/43] | 29.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0047077 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0398339 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1* the whole document * |