EP0587409 - Removal method of glass adhered to sintered object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Narukawa, Akira 879-6, Nakano-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken 510-13 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Mitsuyoshi 2301, Houjin, 5-chome, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 455 / JP | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307057.5 | 07.09.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | JP19920239501 | 08.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23950192 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0587409 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0587409 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587409 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/64, C04B41/53 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
C04B41/91 (EP,US);
C03C15/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/6455 (EP,US);
C04B41/5353 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/5353, C04B41/459, C04B41/5022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1997/27] |
Former [1994/11] | DE, IT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entfernen von an Sinterteilen anhaftendem Glas | [1994/11] | English: | Removal method of glass adhered to sintered object | [1994/11] | French: | Méthode pour enlever du verre adhéré à un objet fritté | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 29.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0320927 (ASEA CERAMA AB [SE]) [DY] 1-6 * example 1; claim - *; | [Y]FR2444523 (ASEA AB [SE]) [Y] 1-6 * claim - *; | [PX]EP0503854 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0118702 (ASEA AB [SE]) [A] 1-6 * claim - *; | [A]GB2200317 (AE PLC) [A] 1-6 * claim - *; | [DA]JPS5888177 | [Y] - O.V. MAZURIN ET AL, Handbook of Glass Data, Part C, AMSTERDAM NL, ELSEVIER, (1987) [Y] 1-6 * page 488; table 2 * * page 487; table 2 * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 27, Database accession no. 83-702244, & JPS5888177 A 19830526 (KOBE STEEL KK) [DA] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - H. SCHOLZE, GLAS, BERLIN DE, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1988) [A] 1 * tables 41-42 * | [A] - C.T. LYNCH, Practical Handbook of Materials Science, BOCA RATON US, CRC PRESS, (1989) [A] 1 * page 283, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * |