EP0588622 - Bleach composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1999/07] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1995/32] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1994/12] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clements, Anthony Henry Bod Maelor, Ffrwd Road, Cefn Y Bedd Nr Wrexham, Clwyd LL12 9SF, Wales / GB | 02 /
Nicholson, John Richard 88 Sherwood Drive Ramsey, New Jersey 07446 / US | 03 /
Kerr, Colin Watt Via 4 Novembre 54 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/47] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/34] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise, Treager & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [1998/38] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1994/12] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307279.5 | 15.09.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | EP19920308431 | 16.09.1992 Original published format: EP 92308431 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588622 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588622 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0588622 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
C11D3/3945 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | Bleichmittel | [1994/12] | English: | Bleach composition | [1994/12] | French: | Composition de blanchissage | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Canonici, Jean-Jacques NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Canonici, Jean-Jacques Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 27.12.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.07.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.02.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.02.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.09.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 17.02.1999 | LI | 17.02.1999 | NL | 17.02.1999 | SE | 17.02.1999 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/23] | CH | 17.02.1999 | |
LI | 17.02.1999 | ||
SE | 17.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 17.02.1999 | |
LI | 17.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 25.05.1999 | |
LI | 25.05.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0435379 ; | [A]FR2336393 ; | [A]EP0267175 ; | [A]EP0106584 ; | [A]EP0068547 ; | [A]WO9118876 | Examination | WO9500626 | Opposition | EP0325289 | WO9007501 | EP0120591 | US4917811 | EP0435379 | US4134850 | - "Development of a test to predict colour fading of cotton fabrics after multi-cycle laundering with a bleach-containing domestic detergent", Duncan Phillips et al., ISDC vol. 112, 1996, pp. 287-293 |