EP0589617 - All-optical repeater for an optical communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Alan 57 Howland Road Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307292.8 | 16.09.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | US19920950521 | 25.09.1992 Original published format: US 950521 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589617 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/16 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
H04B10/299 (EP,US);
H04L7/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/13] | Title | German: | Rein optischer Zwischenverstärker für ein optisches Übertragungssystem | [1994/13] | English: | All-optical repeater for an optical communication system | [1994/13] | French: | Répéteur entièrement optique pour un système de communication optique | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/46] | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/36] | 07.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0456422 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [DA] 1-6,10 * abstract * * column 5, line 23 - line 49 ** column 6, line 31 - line 54 *; | [A] - M.JINNO ET AL, "All-Optical Regenerator based on Nonlinear Fibre Sagnac Interferometer", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., STEVENAGE GB, (19920702), vol. 28, no. 14, pages 1350 - 1352, XP000307842 [A] 1-6,10 * page 1351, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1; figure 1 * | [A] - K.UCHIYAMA ET AL, "Ultrafast Polarisation-Independent All-Optical Switching using a Polarisation Diversity Scheme in the Nonlinear Optical Loop Mirror", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., STEVENAGE GB, (19920924), vol. 28, no. 20, pages 1864 - 1866, XP000315907 [A] 1-6,10 * page 1865, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1; figure 2 * |