EP0589697 - Safety device for ball nut and screw mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street Toledo, OH 43615 / US | [1995/28] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street Toledo, OH 43615 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alfano, Don C. 4228 Ruskin Road Rockford, Illinois 61101 / US | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [1994/13] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307541.8 | 23.09.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | US19920949710 | 23.09.1992 Original published format: US 949710 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589697 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/22, F16H25/24 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
F16H25/2472 (EP,US);
F16H25/2204 (EP,US);
F16H25/2427 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18704 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | Sicherheitseinrichtung für Kugelgewindespindel | [1994/13] | English: | Safety device for ball nut and screw mechanism | [1994/13] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité d'un mécanisme d'écrou et vis à billes | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/24] | 18.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2876653 (MEYER BARTHOLD F) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE9111624U (M. HOLZER) [A] 1 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3425285 (NEFF GEWINDESPINDELN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |