EP0645529 - Thermally insulating engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISUZU CERAMICS RESEARCH INSTITUTE CO., LTD. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states ISUZU CERAMICS RESEARCH INSTITUTE CO., LTD. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Hideo 13-5, Okada 8-chome, Samukawa-machi Koza-gun, Kanagawa / JP | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Flint, Adam, et al Gill Jennings & Every The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Flint, Adam, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1995/13] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307662.2 | 28.09.1993 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0645529 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645529 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02B19/04, F02B19/16, F02F7/00 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
F01N13/107 (EP,US);
F02B19/04 (EP,US);
F02B19/165 (EP,US);
F02F7/0087 (EP,US);
F02B37/007 (EP,US);
F05C2201/021 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/13] | Title | German: | Maschine mit thermischer Isolation | [1995/13] | English: | Thermally insulating engine | [1995/13] | French: | Moteur à isolation thermique | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 01.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 17.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0397521 (ISUZU CERAMICS RES INST [JP]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,6,7; | [YA]JPS595862 ; | [A]WO8502884 (FORD WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS61145318 ; | [A]US2256776 (STEPHEN KAMMER GEORGE) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]US3386422 (PIERRE EYZAT) [A] 1,3,4 * column W * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (1840425), vol. 8, no. 90, Database accession no. (M - 292)<1527> , & JP59005862 A 19840112 (NIPPON TOKUSHU TOGYO K.K) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861121), vol. 10, no. 346, Database accession no. (M - 537)<2402> , & JP61145318 A 19860703 (KYOCERA CORP.) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |