EP0599462 - Display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP | ||
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Izumi, Yoshihiro 508-8, Kuzumoto-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujiwara, Sayuri 606-99, Sanjo-cho Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307729.9 | 29.09.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | JP19920315416 | 25.11.1992 Original published format: JP 31541692 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599462 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599462 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/135, G02F1/136 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
G02F1/1354 (EP,US);
G02F1/1365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/22] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [1994/22] | English: | Display device | [1994/22] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 24.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0490484 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,8-12,20-24 * column 11, line 53 - column 12, line 20 * * column 40, line 35 - column 48, line 50 *; | [AD]JPH05100246 (SHARP KK); | [A]EP0185995 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 9, line 05 - line 24 * * page 10, line 12 - page 15, line 23 *; | [A]EP0463803 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 2-7 * column 3, line 35 - line 58 *; | [A]JPS61175623 ; | [PA]JPH04340932 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 387, Database accession no. (P - 530), & JP61175623 A 00000000 (SEIKO) [A] 2-7 * abstract * | [A] - S.TOGASHI, "AN LC-TV DISPLAY CONTROLLED BY A a-Si DIODE RINGS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SID., LOS ANGELES US, (1985), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 9 - 15 [A] 2-7 * CHAPTERS 2 AND 4;; figure 2 * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 017, no. 194, Database accession no. (P - 1522), & JP04340932 A 19921127 (SEIKO EPSON) [PA] 1,10-12 * abstract * |